IL HB0830 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning protection of persons.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0373 |
2013-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2013 |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-002-000 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-043-000 |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary; 016-000-000 |
2013-03-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2013-03-18 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2013-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-7-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |