IL HB0812 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0353
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Designations Act. Provides that shelter dogs and shelter cats that are residing in or have been adopted from a shelter or rescue facility in this State are designated as the official State pet of the State of Illinois. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE DESIGNATIONS-STATE PET

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0353
2017-08-25HouseEffective Date August 25, 2017
2017-08-25HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 044-005-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateDo Pass State Government; 007-000-000
2017-05-19SenateReported Back To State Government; 003-000-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-12SenateTo Subcommittee on State Designations
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-03-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 14, 2017
2017-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-09HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
2017-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-02-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-02-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
546047New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback