IL HB0811 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Notice By Publication Act. Provides that whenever a governmental unit, community college district, or school district is required to provide notice by publication in a newspaper by law, order of court, or contract, the governmental unit, community college district, or school district may publish the notice on an official government website instead of in a newspaper. Provides conditions concerning the availability and format of the notice webpage. Repeals a Section concerning the placement of published notices on a statewide website and makes corresponding changes throughout the Act and in the Newspaper Legal Notice Act. Effective immediately.
Title
NOTICES-ELECTRONIC PUBLICATION
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] | Rep. Sam Yingling [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] |
Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2021-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
715 | 10 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
715 | 10 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
715 | 5 | 2.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
715 | 5 | 2.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
715 | 5 | 3.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
715 | 5 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=811&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0811.htm |