IL HB0785 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-13 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-13 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 concerning bail. Provides that the incarceration credit does not apply to a person incarcerated for a felony offense who committed the offense when he or she was released on bond, on pretrial release, in pretrial detention, or serving a sentence of incarceration for a separate offense. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM PRO-BAIL CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2021-10-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-21 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 110-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=785&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0785.htm |