IL HB0783 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Changes the sunset date to June 30, 2018 (previously June 30, 2017) for a provision providing that the Secretary of State shall not impose a delinquent registration renewal fee for the registration renewal of passenger vehicles of the first division and motor vehicles of the second division weighing not more than 8,000 pounds if a vehicle's registration expires during a period of time in which the Secretary is not sending registration renewal notices to owners of all of those vehicles with registration expiring at the same time as the applicable vehicle. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-REGISTRATION RENEWAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-821.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback