IL HB0778 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987. Requires the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to establish, in collaboration with the Department of Public Health and the Governor's Office of New Americans, a clinical readiness program to provide direct services to international medical graduate physicians seeking to reestablish their medical careers and obtain residency in this State. Provides that the clinical readiness program for international medical graduate physicians shall be subject to appropriation. Provides that the clinical readiness program shall be implemented pursuant to a New American Plan developed by the Department in accordance with the Governor's Office of New Americans Act and administered by the licensing liaison for international applicants. Provides that the Department may, in its discretion, contract with a vendor or with another State agency, through an intergovernmental agreement, to assist in the implementation and administration of the program. Makes other changes.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Theresa Mah [D] | Rep. William Hauter [R] | Rep. Kevin Olickal [D] | Rep. Bob Morgan [D] |
Rep. Dagmara Avelar [D] | Sen. Michael Halpin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-001-000 |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter |
2024-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 |
2024-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
2024-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-20 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2023-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2023-03-14 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Theresa Mah |
2023-03-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2023-02-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2022-12-06 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5 | 1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |