IL HB0771 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-9)
Status: Enrolled on June 24 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that, if authorized by the fire chief of the fire department, any regularly enrolled volunteer fire fighter may purchase 4 vehicle tires every 3 years through his or her fire department's or municipality's joint purchasing contract relating to the purchase of vehicle tires. Further provides that the firefighter shall cover the cost of the tires and any related taxes. Limits applicability. Amends the Fire Protection District Act making similar changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VOLUNTEER FIRE FIGHTERS-TIRES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-24 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-06-24HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-24HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-24House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 092-001-000
2017-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-28HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-004-000
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Schimpf
2017-05-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 007-002-000
2017-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2017
2017-05-10SenateDo Pass Local Government; 006-002-001
2017-05-03SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-03-23SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-03-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-02-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 1, 2017
2017-02-28SenateArrive in Senate
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-02-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-02-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 005-000-000
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65511-6-9New CodeSee Bill Text
7070510dNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback