IL HB0769 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Commemorative Dates Act. Provides that April 1st of each year is designated as Illinois State Trooper Day, a day to honor the dedicated men and women of the Illinois State Police. Provides that Illinois State Trooper Day shall be observed throughout the State by the citizens of Illinois with civic remembrances of the sacrifices made on their behalf by Illinois' finest, the Illinois State Troopers, especially the ultimate sacrifice given by those State Police Officers who lost their lives in the line of duty. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ILLINOIS STATE TROOPER DAY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateDo Pass State Government; 007-000-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-03-27SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2017-03-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-16SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-16SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Police & First Responders Committee; 014-000-000
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Police & First Responders Committee
2017-02-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2017-02-02HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2017-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-01HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2017-02-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-01-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-01-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5490147New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback