IL HB0764 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0350
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0350
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that if any highway is disconnected or de-annexed, the jurisdiction of the highway shall revert back to the unit of local government or Department of Transportation that had jurisdiction immediately before the annexation. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CD-HIGHWAY DE-ANNEXATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0350 |
2017-08-25 | House | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-05 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-03-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported Back To Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; |
2017-03-28 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Subcommittee/ Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | To Future Roads: Growth & Improvement Subcommittee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson |