IL HB0758 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Vetoed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-21 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-21 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act and the State Finance Act. Removes the allocation formula for the use of the Community Mental Health Medicaid Trust Fund and provides that 100% of the Fund shall be used for the purchase of community mental health services. Removes the reallocation of the first $16,700,000 from the Community Developmental Disabilities Medicaid Trust Fund. Requires the Department of Human Services to annually report to the Governor and the General Assembly upon total deposits into and expenditures from those funds. Provides that the moneys in those funds are exempt from fund sweeps. Effective immediately.
Title
COMMUNITY MHDD SERVICE FUNDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-21 | Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto | |
2009-10-05 | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto October 14, 2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Governor Amendatory Veto | |
2009-06-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-15 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-15 | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 | |
2009-04-23 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link | |
2009-04-22 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Human Services | |
2009-04-06 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | |
2009-04-02 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-04-02 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael W. Frerichs | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-02 | First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-01 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto | |
2009-04-01 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2009-04-01 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2009-04-01 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-04-01 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May | |
2009-04-01 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-31 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook | |
2009-03-04 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Joyce | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-25 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Disability Services Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-02-25 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Disability Services Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-02-25 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Disability Services Committee | |
2009-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | |
2009-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar | |
2009-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2009-02-20 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-02-11 | Assigned to Disability Services Committee | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg |