IL HB0754 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends Public Acts 98-679, 98-680, and 98-681. Adds supplemental appropriations to various agencies for personal services and State contributions to Social Security. Effective immediately .

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$VARIOUS-PERSONAL SERV

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-02-09HouseAssigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback