IL HB0748 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0448
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0448
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nursing Home Care Act and the Health Care Surrogate Act. Provides that within 30 days after admission to a facility in the case of a new resident, and within one year after the effective date of the amendatory Act for all residents who were admitted before that date, residents, agents, and surrogates shall be given written information describing the facility's policies concerning DNR orders and shall be given the opportunity to execute a Living Will or Power of Attorney for Health Care, decline consent to life-sustaining treatment, and provide the facility with the name of a preferred surrogate. Provides that any such decision made by a resident, agent, or surrogate must be recorded in the resident's medical record and that any subsequent changes or modifications must also be recorded in the medical record. Provides that advance directives that a health care facility must maintain include a designation of a preferred surrogate should the person making the designation become incapacitated or impaired. Effective January 1, 2010.
Title
NURSING HOME-ADVANCE DIRECTIVE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-14 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0448 | |
2009-08-14 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-14 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-19 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-19 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 18, 2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Do Pass Public Health; 007-000-000 | |
2009-04-15 | Assigned to Public Health | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-30 | First Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2009-03-26 | Fiscal Note Filed as amended by House Amendment No. 1, from the Illinois Department of Public Health-Office of Health Care Regulation. | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ronald A. Wait | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro | |
2009-03-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-03-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-23 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-03-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg |