IL HB0745 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that on and after the effective date of the bill, each applicant for the issuance or renewal of a Firearm Owner's Identification Card shall provide a full set of his or her fingerprints in electronic format to the Department of State Police. Provides that fingerprints collected shall be checked against the Department of State Police and Federal Bureau of Investigation criminal history record databases now and hereafter filed. Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Removes the option of not providing a set of fingerprints with a concealed carry license application (rather than the Department may accept an application submitted without a set of fingerprints in which case the Department shall be granted 30 days in addition to the 90-day period to issue or deny a license). Makes other conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIREARMS-FINGERPRINTING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-16HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
430654Amended CodeCitation Text
4306620Amended CodeCitation Text
4306630Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback