IL HB0743 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Sales Finance Agency Act to provide that a sales finance agency shall not finance, enter into a retail installment contract, or make a loan for the purchase of a companion animal as defined by the Humane Care for Animals Act. Provides that if a sales finance agency violates the provisions of the Section, the financing, retail installment contract, or loan shall be null and void and the sales finance agency shall have no right to collect, receive, or retain any principal, interest, or charges related to the loan, retail installment contract, or financing.
Title
SALES FINANCE AGENCY ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | To Financial Protection Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=743&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0743.htm |