IL HB0743 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Fire Protection District Act. Provides that a board of trustees of a fire protection district may levy a special tax, by referendum, for the purpose of providing funds to pay for the costs of emergency and rescue crews and equipment at a rate not to exceed 0.10% of the value of all taxable property within the district (rather than to increase the tax rate limit from 0.05% to 0.10%) and changes the wording of the proposition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIRE PROTECTION DIST-REVENUE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass Revenue; 009-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 1, 2017
2017-02-28SenateArrive in Senate
2017-02-23HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-02-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-042-001
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-02-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 005-000-000
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7070524Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback