IL HB0742 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act. Provides that the Office of Inspector General of the Department of Human Services shall continue to have jurisdiction over a community mental health or developmental services agency and the individuals it served at the time the agency's license was revoked for as long as is necessary to ensure the health, safety, and welfare of the individuals the agency served and the accountability of the agency. Effective immediately.
Title
CILA-REVOKED LICENSE-DHS OIG
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Tom Demmer [R] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] |
Rep. John Cavaletto [R] | Rep. Cynthia Soto [D] | Sen. Dale Righter [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 006-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 135 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |