IL HB0734 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the bill as introduced, with the following changes: Provides that certain orders may be permanent at the victim's request. If a civil no contact order entered under a specified section of the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 conflicts with an order issued pursuant to the Juvenile Court Act of 1987 or the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act, the conflicting order issued under the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 shall be void.
Title
NO CONTACT ORDER-SEX CRIMES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0184 |
2021-07-30 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2021 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Dave Vella |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-03-23 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
2021-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 112A-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |