IL HB0726 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code and various Acts relating to the governance of public universities and community colleges in Illinois. With respect to the requirement that the events of Black History be taught in every public elementary school and high school, provides that a student may not complete the 8th grade or graduate from high school without studying this material and that a school may meet this requirement through an online program or course. Requires every public institution of higher education and community college to offer a course studying the events of Black History. Allows public institutions of higher education and community colleges to meet the requirement by offering an online course.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD/HIGHER ED-BLACK HISTORY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-01-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105527-20.4Amended CodeCitation Text
110305100New CodeSee Bill Text
11052085New CodeSee Bill Text
1106605-195New CodeSee Bill Text
11066510-195New CodeSee Bill Text
11067015-195New CodeSee Bill Text
11067520-200New CodeSee Bill Text
11068025-195New CodeSee Bill Text
11068530-205New CodeSee Bill Text
11069035-200New CodeSee Bill Text
1108053-29.11New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback