IL HB0720 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a person may operate an all-terrain vehicle or recreational off-highway vehicle on a roadway that is not a State highway, federal highway, or within the boundaries of an incorporated area and where the speed limit 55 miles per hour or less (rather than 35 miles per hour or less).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NON-HIGHWAY VEH-55 MPH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Chris Miller
2021-03-18HouseTo Transportation Issues Subcommittee
2021-03-02HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2021-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2021-02-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2021-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg
2021-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Chris Miller

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-1426.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback