IL HB0717 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that nothing in the provisions prohibiting the carrying of a concealed firearm in certain areas prevents a concealed carry licensee who is a county or State correctional officer, a judge of the Supreme, Appellate, or Circuit Court of this State or an Associate Judge of the Circuit Court, a judge of the United States District Court, United States Court of Appeals, or the United States Supreme Court, a State's Attorney, or Assistant State's Attorney with the consent of the State's Attorney, from carrying a concealed firearm in any area prohibited by these provisions, other than an area where firearms are prohibited under federal law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONCEALED CARRY-OFFICIALS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4306665Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback