IL HB0707 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-21 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-21 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides various penalties for knowingly withholding information from a practitioner from whom a person seeks to obtain a controlled substance or a prescription for a controlled substance. Provides that a health care practitioner with the intent to provide a controlled substance or combination of controlled substances that are not medically necessary to his or her patient or an amount of controlled substances that is not medically necessary for his or her patient, may not provide a controlled substance or a prescription for a controlled substance by misrepresentation, fraud, forgery, deception, subterfuge, or concealment of a material fact. Provides that a violation is a Class 4 felony for the first offense and a Class 3 felony for each subsequent offense. The fine for the first offense shall be not more than $100,000. The fine for each subsequent offense shall not be more than $200,000.
Title
CONTROLLED SUB-WITHHOLD INFO
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | Tabled |
2017-03-21 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-03-03 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-02-16 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 406 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=707&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0707.htm |