IL HB0695 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Legislative Information System Act. Provides that within one year after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Legislative Information System shall create a Spanish-language version of its website to provide legislative information. Specifies the legislative information to be placed on the Spanish-language website, and allows for the placement of additional unspecified information. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
GA WEBSITE-SPANISH LANGUAGE
Sponsors
Rep. Silvana Tabares [D] | Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] | Rep. Cynthia Soto [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] | Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-02-15 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 145 | 5.09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |