IL HB0694 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0273
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0273
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that, with respect to the supporting documentation required to obtain a plate for a veteran with a disability, the Secretary of State shall allow an applicant to redact information on the documentation that pertains to the nature of the applicant's health issue. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-VETERAN HEALTH INFO
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0273 |
2021-08-06 | House | Effective Date August 6, 2021 |
2021-08-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 019-000-000 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-609 | Amended Code | Citation Text |