IL HB0683 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the maximum length of a truck tractor in combination with a semitrailer may not exceed 65 feet (rather than 55 feet) overall dimension on all non-State highways. Removes the requirement that truck tractor-semitrailer combinations must have no more than a maximum 55 feet overall wheel base on Class III roadways and other non-designated State highways. Provides that the distance between the kingpin and the axle of a semitrailer longer than 48 feet, in combination with a truck tractor, may not exceed 42 feet 6 inches, unless the trailer or semitrailer is used for the transport of livestock.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-LENGTH AND SIZE REQ

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2017
2017-04-25SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-03-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-30SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-29SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-006-000
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-02-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625515-107Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback