IL HB0682 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Local Initiative Sunshine Act. Provides that beginning on July 1, 2017 or on the effective date of the Act, whichever is later, the Office of the Comptroller shall create and maintain a searchable database website to provide information concerning recipients of gubernatorial or legislative member initiatives. Sets forth the requirements for the website database. Provides for the purpose of the Act. Defines terms. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL INITIATIVE-DATABASE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-24SenatePostponed - Government Reform
2017-05-19SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-10SenatePostponed - Government Reform
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Government Reform
2017-04-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-27SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-27SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-002-000
2017-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Government Transparency Committee; 009-000-000
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Government Transparency Committee
2017-03-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-02-22HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Government Transparency Committee; 007-000-000
2017-02-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Government Transparency Committee
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback