IL HB0672 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Removes language requiring employees who are not members of a representing labor organization to pay a proportionate share of the costs of the collective bargaining process, contract administration, and pursuing matters affecting wages, hours, and conditions of employment under a collective bargaining agreement. Provides that employees shall not be required to perform certain acts as a condition of obtaining or continuing public employment. Provides that an agreement, contract, understanding, or practice between or involving a public employer, labor organization, or exclusive representative that requires an employee to perform certain forbidden acts as a condition of obtaining or continuing public employment is unlawful and unenforceable. Removes language concerning fair share agreements in collective bargaining. Removes the term "fair share agreement". Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LABOR RELATIONS-RIGHT TO WORK

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-23HouseTo Workforce Reconciliation Subcommittee
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
531510Amended CodeCitation Text
53153Amended CodeCitation Text
53154Amended CodeCitation Text
53156Amended CodeCitation Text
53159Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback