IL HB0667 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Alternate Fuels Act. Amends the State Finance Act. Repeals a provision concerning the Alternate Fuels Fund. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Deletes a provision concerning a rebate and grant program authorized by the Alternate Fuels Act. Effective immediately.
Title
ALTERNATE FUELS ACT-REPEAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | Tabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g) |
2017-03-29 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Energy Committee; 007-006-002 |
2017-03-22 | House | Remains in Energy Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Energy Committee; 006-006-002 |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Energy Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.427 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
415 | 120 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 13C-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=667&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0667.htm |