IL HB0616 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code and Fire Protection District Act. Provides that after a firefighter is selected from the register of eligibles to fill a vacancy in a fire department or fire protection district, each appointee shall be presented with his or her certificate of appointment on the day on which he or she is sworn in as a classified member of the affected department or district. Provides that firefighters who were not issued a certificate of appointment when originally appointed may make a written request to receive one. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIRE APPOINTMENT CERTIFICATES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-22HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0252
2017-08-22HouseEffective Date August 22, 2017
2017-08-22HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Local Government; 009-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-03-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-02-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading February 28, 2017
2017-02-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-02-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2017-02-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 005-000-000
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65510-1-7.1Amended CodeCitation Text
65510-2.1-4Amended CodeCitation Text
65510-2.1-6.3Amended CodeCitation Text
7070516.04aAmended CodeCitation Text
7070516.06bAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback