IL HB0616 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Prompt Payment Act. Defines "qualified provider" as (i) an organization that provides non-residential services for the elderly or for the prevention, intervention, or treatment of mental illness, developmental disabilities, or alcoholism or substance abuse or (ii) an entity licensed under the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act; but does not include a licensed hospital. Provides that a properly prepared voucher request to the Office of the Comptroller for payment to a qualified provider shall be given priority by the Comptroller for processing and warrant issuance after debt service obligations and payroll obligations of the State have been met unless the Comptroller deems that other obligations of the State must be satisfied prior to these categories of payment. Provides that, if at any time the Comptroller determines that there are insufficient funds available to process priority payments, then vouchers shall be processed and paid out in a first-in, first-out manner as corresponding funds become available. Effective immediately.
Title
PROMPT PAYMENT-CARE PROVIDERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-03-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose | |
2009-03-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski | |
2009-03-17 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano | |
2009-03-12 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin | |
2009-03-12 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2009-03-10 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah L. Graham | |
2009-03-05 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-05 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Osterman | |
2009-03-04 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2009-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar | |
2009-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Bassi | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-25 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 017-000-000 | |
2009-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2009-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris | |
2009-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2009-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan | |
2009-02-11 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2009-02-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson | |
2009-02-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-02-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-02-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook | |
2009-02-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser | |
2009-02-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-05 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Coulson |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=616&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0616.htm |