IL HB0612 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
Pending: Senate Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
Pending: Senate Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In a Section granting a homestead exemption to veterans with disabilities, provides that property that is used as a qualified residence by a veteran who was a member of the United States Armed Forces during World War II is exempt from taxation regardless of the veteran's level of disability. Provides that a veteran who qualifies as a result of his or her service in World War II need not reapply for the exemption. Makes changes concerning service-connected disabilities. Makes changes concerning surviving spouses. Effective immediately.
Title
REVENUE-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Brandun Schweizer [R] | Rep. Mark Walker [D] | Rep. Kevin Schmidt [R] |
Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
2024-04-19 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer |
2024-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2024-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 017-000-000 |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-04-17 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2023-03-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2023-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2023-02-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2022-12-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 128 | 1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |