IL HB0583 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Horse Meat Act. Restores language that exempted certain types of horse meat from regulation under the Act. Repeals a provision that prohibits the slaughter of horses for human consumption. Amends the Animals Intended for Food Act. Expands the definition of "animal" to include "horses, mules, or other equidae". Amends the Illinois Equine Infectious Anemia Control Act. Allows equidae more than 12 months of age to enter the State for immediate slaughter without a certificate of veterinary inspection. Requires equidae entering the State for immediate slaughter to be accompanied by a consignment direct to slaughter at an approved equine slaughtering establishment. Amends the Humane Care for Animals Act. Creates an exemption from the general prohibition against selling, offering to sell, leading, riding, transporting, or driving on any public way any equidae that, because of debility, disease, lameness or any other cause, could not be worked in this State. Deletes a provision that prohibited injured equidae from being sent directly to a slaughter facility. Amends the Humane Slaughter of Livestock Act. Deletes a provision in the definition of the term "livestock" that excludes "horses, mules, or other equidae to be used in and for the preparation of meat or meat products for consumption by human beings". Imposes conditions on any rulemaking authority. Effective immediately.
Title
ANIMALS--HORSE MEAT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed | |
2009-03-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-31 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended | |
2009-03-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended | |
2009-03-27 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended | |
2009-03-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended | |
2009-03-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended | |
2009-03-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended | |
2009-03-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended | |
2009-03-25 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-25 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-25 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John A. Fritchey | |
2009-03-25 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John A. Fritchey | |
2009-03-25 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John A. Fritchey | |
2009-03-17 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Shane Cultra | |
2009-03-17 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose | |
2009-03-17 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell | |
2009-03-17 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-03-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-03-17 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2009-03-17 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2009-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-03-10 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 011-001-000 | |
2009-03-10 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee | |
2009-03-05 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-05 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2009-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2009-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer | |
2009-03-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2009-03-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis | |
2009-03-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost | |
2009-03-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-24 | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 011-002-000 | |
2009-02-11 | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-05 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Sacia |