IL HB0577 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0267
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0267
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes changes to provisions regarding youth suicide awareness and prevention. Sets forth some of the characteristics of students at an increased risk of suicide. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-PREVENT YOUTH SUICIDE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0267 |
2021-08-06 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2022 |
2021-08-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2021 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 012-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-15 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-03-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-003-000 |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.166 | Amended Code | Citation Text |