IL HB0573 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0129
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0129
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Treasurer Act. Establishes the Illinois Higher Education Savings Program as a part of the College Savings Pool (currently, not a part of the College Savings Pool), subject to appropriation by the General Assembly. Requires the Department of Public Health and the Department of Revenue to provide the State Treasurer with specified information concerning eligible children under the Program. Modifies provisions concerning seed funds, unclaimed seed funds, and incentives and partnerships. Establishes the Illinois Higher Education Savings Program Fund as a special fund in the State treasury (currently, held outside of the State treasury). Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the Director of Revenue may exchange information with the State Treasurer's Office for the purpose of administering the Illinois Higher Education Savings Program. Amends the State Finance Act to provide for the Illinois Higher Education Savings Program Fund. Modifies defined terms. Makes conforming and other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED SAVINGS PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0129 |
2021-07-23 | House | Effective Date July 23, 2021 |
2021-07-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2021 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 013-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-045-000 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 006-004-000 |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 505 | 16.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.935 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 917 | Amended Code | Citation Text |