IL HB0569 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0242
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0242
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Central Management Services to convey real estate to the City of Marion for $1. Provides that the property shall revert to the State if the property is no longer used for public purposes. Effective immediately.
Title
CONVEYANCE-MARION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-11 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0242 | |
2009-08-11 | Effective Date August 11, 2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-15 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-15 | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Do Pass Executive; 008-000-000 | |
2009-04-30 | Postponed - Executive | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-26 | First Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-11 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 | |
2009-02-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-24 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-20 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur L. Turner | |
2009-02-19 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-19 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000 | |
2009-02-11 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-05 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |