IL HB0556 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Board of Higher Education Act. Provides that, beginning with the 2010-2011 academic year, the minimum admission standards established by the Board of Higher Education for public community colleges and universities must provide for a preference for persons who were engaged in the active military or naval service of the United States for a period of at least one year and who were honorably discharged and for persons who were engaged in such military or naval service who are currently or may thereafter be on inactive or reserve duty in such military or naval service, not including, however, persons who were convicted by court-martial of disobedience of orders.
Title
HIGHER ED ADMISSIONS-VET PREF
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | |
2009-02-09 | Assigned to Higher Education Committee | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-04 | First Reading | |
2009-02-04 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=556&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0556.htm |