IL HB0543 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. In fiscal year 2016 and in each fiscal year thereafter, requires the transfer from the General Revenue Fund to the Agricultural Premium Fund and the Fair and Exposition Fund of amounts equal to 100% of the total statutory payments required from those special funds for that fiscal year to county fairs and fair and exposition authorities under the Agricultural Fair Act. In each of the fiscal years 2011 through 2015, requires transfer of an amount equal to a lower, specified percentage of those total statutory payments. Provides that the required transfer amounts are the maximum amounts to be transferred in each fiscal year, notwithstanding any other law to the contrary. Amends the Agricultural Fair Act. With respect to the distribution formula for premiums to county fairs, uses either of the 2 previous fiscal years (now, either fiscal year 1984 or 1985).
Title
AGRICULTURAL FAIR ACT-FUNDING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-27 | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-05-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended | |
2010-05-26 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended | |
2010-05-24 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 007-004-000 | |
2010-05-24 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee | |
2010-05-24 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended | |
2010-05-24 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-05-21 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2010-05-21 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2010-05-17 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended | |
2010-05-13 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2010-05-07 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2010-05-07 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2010-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 | |
2010-05-07 | Arrived in House | |
2010-05-07 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-05-07 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-05-07 | Third Reading - Passed; 031-026-000 | |
2010-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cullerton | |
2010-05-07 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2010-05-07 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 008-004-000 | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2010-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2010 | |
2010-04-30 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 29, 2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Do Pass Executive; 008-001-004 | |
2010-04-23 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2010-04-22 | Re-assigned to Executive | |
2009-05-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-06 | Held in Agriculture and Conservation | |
2009-04-29 | Postponed - Agriculture and Conservation | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-17 | First Reading | |
2009-03-13 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-11 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2009-03-11 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 060-057-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2009-03-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-03 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-25 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 | |
2009-02-25 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-02-25 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee | |
2009-02-09 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-04 | First Reading | |
2009-02-04 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Reitz |