IL HB0528 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-19)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Sexual Assault Evidence Submission Act. Provides that the Department of State Police shall create and operate a statewide sexual assault evidence kit tracking system. Provides that the statewide sexual assault evidence kit tracking system shall: (1) track the location and status of sexual assault evidence kits throughout the criminal justice process, including the initial collection in examinations performed at medical facilities, receipt at local law enforcement agencies, and receipt and analysis at forensic laboratories; (2) allow medical facilities performing sexual assault forensic examinations, law enforcement agencies, prosecutors, State and local crime laboratories, and other entities who have physical custody of sexual assault evidence kits to update and track the status and location of sexual assault evidence kits; (3) allow victims of sexual assault to anonymously track and receive updates regarding the status of their sexual assault evidence kit; and (4) use technology to allow continuous access for appropriate personnel. Provides that the Department may phase in initial participation in the statewide sexual assault evidence kit tracking system by region, volume, or other appropriate classification. Provides that all entities who have custody of sexual assault evidence kits shall fully participate in the system by no later than July 1, 2019. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SEXUAL ASSAULT EVIDNC TRACKING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-20SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-04-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2017-04-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-04-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-17SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-14HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-09HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-03-09HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-03-09HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-16HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-01-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-01-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-01-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
72520221New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback