IL HB0486 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Operations Act. Provides that a person employed as a legislative liaison for, or otherwise employed by, an executive branch officer or an agency, board, or commission under the control of an executive branch officer may not lobby on the floor of the House of Representatives while the House of Representatives is in session or the floor of the Senate while the Senate is in session. Defines "lobby" as any communication with a member of the House of Representatives or the Senate or any employee of the House of Representatives or the Senate for the ultimate purpose of influencing any executive, legislative, or administrative action. Effective immediately.
Title
EXEC STAFF-LOBBYING BAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=486&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0486.htm |