IL HB0473 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that after January 1, 2018 no non-home rule unit within the counties of Cook, DuPage, Kane, Lake, Madison, McHenry, St. Clair, and Will may enact or continue to enforce an ordinance for an automated traffic law enforcement system to enforce violations of intersection traffic control signals. Provides that an automated traffic law enforcement system is a system, in a municipality or county, not including a non-home rule unit within the designated counties on or after January 1, 2018, operated by a governmental agency, that produces a recorded image of a motor vehicle's violation of a provision of the Code or a local ordinance and is designed to obtain a clear recorded image of the vehicle and the vehicle's license plate. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement from the State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-REPEAL REDLIGHT CAMERAS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-29HouseTo Red Light Camera Subcommittee
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-01-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-01-20HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-20HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.41New CodeSee Bill Text
625511-208Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-208.6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback