IL HB0443 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Creates the Illinois School Choice Program, which shall be administered by the State Board of Education. Provides that any State-recognized, non-public school wishing to enroll eligible students and be reimbursed for vouchers available under specified provisions shall notify the State Board of Education in writing of its intent. Specifies the eligibility for reimbursement of vouchers. Specifies reporting requirements for non-public schools that are participating in the Program. Contains provisions concerning the calculation of vouchers and how they may be used by parents. Contains provisions concerning the verification of the household income of participating parents. Provides that the State Board of Education shall adopt rules for implementation of the Program. Amends the State Finance Act to create the School Choice Fund as a special fund in the State treasury and provides that permitted fees collected by the State Board of Education shall be deposited into the Fund and shall be used by the State Board of Education to cover the administrative costs of the Program. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-TUITION VOUCHERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29HouseTabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g)
2017-03-29HouseMotion Do Pass - Lost Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 006-011-000
2017-03-29HouseRemains in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-03-29HouseMotion Do Pass - Lost Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 006-011-000
2017-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-01-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-17HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.170New CodeSee Bill Text
301055.878New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback