IL HB0425 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0294
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0294
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regional Superintendent of Schools Article of the School Code with respect to the Section concerning salaries. Removes certain provisions concerning the abolition of the office of regional superintendent of schools in educational services regions containing 2,000,000 or more inhabitants. Provides that references to "regional superintendent" shall also include a chief administrative officer of certain educational service centers. Provides that references to "assistant regional superintendent" shall include one assistant appointed by a chief administrative officer. Provides that for the purposes of calculating regional superintendent and assistant regional superintendent salaries for educational service centers, populations shall be established by subtracting from the total county population the population of a city with 500,000 or more inhabitants, divided by the number of educational service centers in the county.
Title
SCH CD-REG SUPERINTENDENT
Sponsors
Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Elaine Nekritz [D] | Rep. Thaddeus Jones [D] | Rep. James Durkin [R] |
Rep. David Harris [R] | Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-24 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0294 |
2017-08-24 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-24 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 035-019-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 008-004-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-016-001 |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 007-002-000 |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 3-2.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |