IL HB0391 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit for taxpayers who employ individuals working within the engineering sector who graduated from an accredited institution of higher learning with a Bachelor's degree or higher. Provides that the credit shall be equal to 10% of the compensation paid for the first through fifth years of employment in the engineering sector if the qualified employee graduated from an institution located in Illinois or 5% of the compensation paid for the first through fifth years of employment in the engineering sector if the qualified employee graduated from an institution not located in Illinois. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-ENGINEERING STUDENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=391&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0391.htm |