IL HB0389 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Deletes a provision authorizing an action to be commenced in any county if all defendants are nonresidents of this State. Limits venue for actions against corporations, partnerships, and insurance companies. Provides that in actions in which no party is a resident of this State and over which another forum has jurisdiction, the court shall, upon motion, dismiss the action subject to specified conditions. Provides that joint and several liability attaches when a defendant is found to be 50%, rather than 25%, at fault. Limits amounts recovered for medical care, treatment, or services and caretaking expenses to the amounts actually paid for those expenses regardless of the amounts initially billed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIV PRO-VENUE; TORT LIABILITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-24HouseTo Tort Liability Law Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73552-101Amended CodeCitation Text
73552-102Amended CodeCitation Text
73552-103Amended CodeCitation Text
73552-110New CodeSee Bill Text
73552-1107.1Amended CodeCitation Text
73552-1117Amended CodeCitation Text
73552-1205.2New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback