IL HB0387 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-12)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Limited Liability Company Act. Reduces some fees in the fee schedule for limited liability companies filing documents with the Secretary of State to match the fees for similar documents in the fee schedule for corporations. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LLC FEE SCHEDULE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-02-24HouseTo Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee
2017-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-02-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-01-24HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-01-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
80518050-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback