IL HB0377 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-16 - Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee; (Motion to Table Motion to Reconsider)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-16 - Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee; (Motion to Table Motion to Reconsider)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that none of the retirement benefits provided in the Article shall be paid to any person who is impeached by the House of Representatives and convicted and removed from office by the Senate. Provides that all participants in service or entering service after the effective date shall be deemed to have consented to the provisions as a condition of participation in the retirement system. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-GA-IMPEACHMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-16 | Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee; (Motion to Table Motion to Reconsider) | |
2009-08-16 | Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee; (Motion to Reconsider Vote) | |
2009-04-01 | Motion Filed to Table the Motion to Reconsider the Vote Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-03-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2009-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Julie Hamos | |
2009-03-04 | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-03-04 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-004-000 | |
2009-03-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-03 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-26 | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 008-000-000 | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2009-02-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May | |
2009-02-23 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2009-02-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-02-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley | |
2009-02-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-02-09 | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Joyce | |
2009-02-04 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2009-02-02 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | |
2009-02-02 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Careen M. Gordon | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-30 | First Reading | |
2009-01-29 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2009-01-29 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey | |
2009-01-29 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker | |
2009-01-29 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith Farnham |