IL HB0372 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Homeowners' Energy Policy Statement Act. Provides that no political subdivision may place any restriction, either directly or indirectly, on the installation or use of a solar energy system unless the restriction: serves to preserve or protect public health or safety; or does not significantly decrease its production or efficiency. Limits home rule powers. Effective immediately.
Title
SOLAR POWER-LIMIT HOME RULE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=372&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0372.htm |