IL HB0369 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Bedbugs Disclosure to Employees Act. Requires an employer to notify employees if a person certified under the Structural Pest Control Act has determined the presence of bedbugs at the place of employment. Provides that such notification shall be made electronically via email or, if notice by email is not possible, the employer shall issue a written notification to each employee or post a written notification in a conspicuous place or places used or reserved for employee notices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BEDBUG DISCLOSURE TO EMPLOYEES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 025-000-000
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-29HouseArrived in House
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2017-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez
2017-05-29SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-000-000
2017-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Public Health; 007-000-000
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-011-001
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 027-000-000
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 024-005-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback