IL HB0355 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that when operational needs indicate that reduction in the square footage of a leased property is necessary and in the best interests of the State, a contract for the lease of real property may be amended to reduce the square footage of the leased property, regardless of the method of procurement or source selection. Effective immediately.
Title
PROCUREMENT-LEASE OF PROPERTY
Sponsors
Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Mike Murphy [R] | Rep. Margaret Croke [D] | Sen. Seth Lewis [R] |
Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] | Sen. Doris Turner [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0018 |
2021-06-25 | House | Effective Date June 25, 2021 |
2021-06-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Reported Back To Executive; 003-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | To Executive- Procurement |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 105-002-001 |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-10 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |