IL HB0343 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Assigned to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Budget Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Removes references to General Assembly members from provisions concerning funding for salaries of General Assembly members, judges, and legislative operations. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE BUDGET-GA MEMBER SALARY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-01-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2019-01-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152050-22Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback