IL HB0340 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Assigned to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Illinois Public Aid Code, the Problem Pregnancy Health Services and Care Act, and the Illinois Abortion Law of 1975. Restores the provisions that were amended by Public Act 100-538 to the form in which they existed before their amendment by Public Act 100-538.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ABORTION-VARIOUS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-01-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2019-01-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-01-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-01-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick Windhorst

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5Amended CodeCitation Text
30555-8Amended CodeCitation Text
30555-9Amended CodeCitation Text
30556-1Amended CodeCitation Text
4102304-100Amended CodeCitation Text
53756Amended CodeCitation Text
53756.1Amended CodeCitation Text
7205101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback